Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Jacques Fauche de Domprel

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹Born
21 Feb 166164.1AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
1 May 166164.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
11 Mar 166265.1DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Fauche de Domprel
Archbishop Jean-Jacques Fauche de Domprel (born 1597, died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePontarlier

  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast