Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Saulnier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France

Titular Bishop of Andravida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1596Born
16 Apr 164043.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France
16 Apr 164043.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Andravida
17 Jun 164043.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Andravida
25 Apr 168184.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph Saulnier
Bishop Joseph Saulnier O.S.B. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrnans

  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 83
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast