Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine-Pierre de Grammont, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1615Born
15 Jan 166347.7AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
20 Jan 166448.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
1 May 169883.0DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Pierre de Grammont
Archbishop Antoine-Pierre de Grammont O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelisey

  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 115
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast