Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Jean-Gustave Blanc, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Corea

Titular Bishop of Antigonea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1844Born
22 Dec 186622.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
26 Jul 188238.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Corea
26 Jul 188238.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Antigonea
8 Jul 188339.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antigonea
20 Jun 188440.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Corea
21 Feb 189045.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Corea

MicroData Summary for Marie-Jean-Gustave Blanc
Bishop Marie-Jean-Gustave Blanc M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Corea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReugney, France
Ordained BishopNagasaki

  • a priest for 23.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 31
  • ab/ob: CB, 27 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast