Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc-Antoine Berdolet

Deceased

Bishop of Aachen, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1740Born
9 Apr 176726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
24 Apr 179655.6SelectedBishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
15 Aug 179655.9Ordained BishopBishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
Oct 1801³61.0ResignedBishop of [Haut-Rhin (Constitutional), France]
30 May 180261.7AppointedBishop of Aachen, Germany
13 Aug 180968.9DiedBishop of Aachen, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marc-Antoine Berdolet (VIAF: 24710821)
Bishop Marc-Antoine Berdolet (born , died ) Bishop of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRougemont-le-Château
Ordained BishopDominican, Church, Colmar
Death PlaceAix-la-Chapelle, Diocese of Aachen

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 85
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast