Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Rye

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566Born
1 Apr 160034.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 162357.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Besançon, France
9 Jan 162357.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
17 May 162660.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
20 Aug 163670.6SucceededArchbishop of Besançon, France
17 Apr 163771.2DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for François de Rye:
Archbishop François de Rye (died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 126, and Page 115
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015