Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gérard Antoine Léopold Daucourt

Bishop Emeritus of Nanterre, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1941 Born
26 Jun 196625.1Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
1 Feb 199149.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Troyes, France
14 Apr 199149.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Troyes, France
4 Apr 199250.9SucceededBishop of Troyes, France
2 Jul 199857.1AppointedBishop of Orléans, France
18 Jun 200261.1AppointedBishop of Nanterre, France
22 Sep 200261.3InstalledBishop of Nanterre, France
14 Nov 201372.5ResignedBishop of Nanterre, France

MicroData Summary for Gérard Antoine Léopold Daucourt
Bishop Gérard Antoine Léopold Daucourt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Nanterre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDélémont, Switzerland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nanterre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,398
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Aug 2017