Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude Le Coz

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1740Born
28 Feb 179150.1SelectedBishop of [Ille-et-Vilaine (Constitutional), France]
10 Apr 179150.3Ordained BishopBishop of [Ille-et-Vilaine (Constitutional), France]
1801²60.0ResignedBishop of [Ille-et-Vilaine (Constitutional), France]
9 Apr 180261.2SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
29 Apr 180261.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
3 May 181574.3DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude Le Coz (VIAF: 44325358)
Archbishop Claude Le Coz (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlonévez-Porzay
Ordained BishopS. Roch, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Death PlaceVilleviieux, Jura

  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Oct 2018

Quantcast