Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stanislas-Arthur-Xavier Cardinal Touchet

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1848BornSoliers
29 Jun 187223.6Ordained PriestPriest of Besançon, France
29 Jan 189445.2SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
18 May 189445.5ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
15 Jul 189445.7Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
11 Dec 192274.1Elevated to Cardinal
11 Dec 192274.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
23 Sep 192677.9DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Stanislas-Arthur-Xavier Touchet:
Cardinal Stanislas-Arthur-Xavier Touchet (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.2 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013