Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Clériade Cardinal de Choiseul-Beaupré

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1707Born
17 Nov 175447.1SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
17 Mar 175547.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
25 May 175547.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
23 Nov 176154.1Elevated to Cardinal
7 Jan 177466.2DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine Clériade de Choiseul-Beaupré
Antoine Clériade Cardinal de Choiseul-Beaupré (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastle of Daillecourt

  • a bishop for 18.6 years
  • a cardinal for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Nov 1761
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 123
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast