Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marie-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste-André-Clément-Fulbert Petit

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1832BornSaint-Fort-sur-Gironde
6 Jun 185724.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
2 May 188754.8SelectedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
26 May 188754.8ConfirmedBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
25 Jul 188755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Le Puy-en-Velay, France
29 Jan 189461.5SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
18 May 189461.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
28 Aug 190977.1DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste-André-Clément-Fulbert Petit:
Archbishop Marie-Joseph-Jean-Baptiste-André-Clément-Fulbert Petit (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 104, and Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013