Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Claude D’Achey

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1594³Born
17 Dec 162026.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 May 163843.6AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
12 Dec 163844.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Besançon, France
7 Oct 165460.0DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude D’Achey
Archbishop Claude D’Achey (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGray

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 115
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1638, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast