Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Xaver von Neveu

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1749³Born
15 Mar 177728.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basel, Switzerland
2 Jun 179243.2SelectedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
12 Sep 179445.5ConfirmedBishop of Basel, Switzerland
23 Nov 179445.7Ordained BishopBishop of Basel, Switzerland
1795²45.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Besançon, France
1801²51.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Besançon, France
23 Aug 182879.4DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Xaver von Neveu (VIAF: 221107639)
Bishop Franz Xaver von Neveu (born , died ) Bishop of Basel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHochstift Basel

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,967
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1794, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast