Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antoine Cardinal Perrenot de Granvella

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1517Born
29 Nov 153821.2AppointedBishop of Arras, France
1540²22.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 May 154224.7Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
26 Feb 156143.5Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156143.5AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
6 Jul 156244.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
14 May 156850.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
10 Feb 157052.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
9 Jun 157052.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 Jul 157860.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
3 Oct 157861.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
24 Jan 158365.4ResignedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
25 Jun 158466.8SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
14 Nov 158467.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
21 Sep 158669.0DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Antoine Perrenot de Granvella (VIAF: 34616793)
Antoine Cardinal Perrenot de Granvella (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrnans
Ordained BishopValladolid, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.3 years
  • a cardinal for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 53, Number 292
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 134, and Page 239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1542, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Sep 2017