Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Luc Marie Maurice Louis Bouilleret

Archbishop of Besançon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1953 BornArbois (Jura)
28 Jun 198127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint-Claude, France
10 Mar 200349.4AppointedBishop of Amiens, France
11 May 200349.5Ordained BishopBishop of Amiens, France
10 Oct 201360.0AppointedArchbishop of Besançon, France
17 Nov 201360.1InstalledArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Luc Marie Maurice Louis Bouilleret:
Archbishop Jean-Luc Marie Maurice Louis Bouilleret (born ) Archbishop of Besançon

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Besançon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,375
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2013
  • i: CB, 18 Nov 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Sep 2014