Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Etienne-Théodore Cuénot, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Metellopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1802BornBélieu, France
24 Sep 182523.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
9 Sep 183129.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
9 Sep 183129.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
3 May 183533.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metellopolis
31 Jul 184038.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
11 Mar 184442.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam
14 Nov 186159.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}, Viet Nam
11 Apr 1909Beatified
19 Jun 1988Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Etienne-Théodore Cuénot:
Bishop St. Etienne-Théodore Cuénot M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Cochin {Cocincina Orientale}

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013