Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ignazio Cardinal Masotti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Cardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1817Born
26 Sep 187962.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
30 Mar 188265.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
10 Nov 188467.8Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 188467.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
12 Aug 188669.5AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
Jan 1887³69.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
31 Oct 188871.7DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignazio Masotti
Ignazio Cardinal Masotti (born , died ) Prefect of Bishops and Regulars

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlí, Diocese of Forli, Italy
Death PlaceApt at Palazzo Altemps, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Propaganda Fide chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 54
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Nov 1884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017