Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Antonio Gokim Cardinal Tagle

Prefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Cardinal-Bishop of San Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1957 Born
27 Feb 198224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Imus, Philippines
22 Oct 200144.3AppointedBishop of Imus, Philippines
12 Dec 200144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Imus, Philippines
13 Oct 201154.3AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Dec 201154.4InstalledArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
24 Nov 201255.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 201255.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle
15 Jun 201355.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle
8 Dec 201962.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
1 May 202062.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of San Felice da Cantalice a Centocelle

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Gokim Tagle (VIAF: 51085495)
Luis Antonio Gokim Cardinal Tagle (born ) Prefect of Evangelization of Peoples

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines
Ordained BishopCathedral, Imus, Diocese of Imus, Philippines

Please contact the Cardinal through the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ab: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,083
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • card: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2019
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 9 Aug 2020

Quantcast