Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Caprano

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1759Born
23 Feb 178222.9Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181657.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iconium
17 Mar 181657.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iconium
23 Nov 182263.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
10 Mar 182364.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
2 Oct 182667.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
15 Dec 182869.7Elevated to Cardinal
4 Apr 182970.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
21 May 182970.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
24 Feb 183474.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index

MicroData Summary for Pietro Caprano (VIAF: 89061078)
Pietro Cardinal Caprano (born , died ) Prefect of Index

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
  • a cardinal for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 5
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 221
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast