Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Castelli

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1705Born
24 Sep 175953.9Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175954.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
26 Apr 176357.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
9 Apr 178074.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Castelli
Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Castelli (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 20.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast