Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Maria Cardinal Gotti, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1834Born
12 Nov 185117.6ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
20 Dec 185622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
22 Mar 189257.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
27 Mar 189257.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
19 Apr 189258.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
29 Nov 189561.6Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 189561.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
1 Dec 189662.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Indulgences and Relics
20 Nov 189965.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
29 Jul 190268.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
26 Feb 191681.9ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
19 Mar 191681.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Maria Gotti (VIAF: 49404178)
Girolamo Maria Cardinal Gotti O.C.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Archdiocese of Genova, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Albenga, Diocese of Albenga, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Maria della Scala, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Carmelite Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Giovanni Battista Chapel, S. Maria della Scala, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
  • a cardinal for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 449, and Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017