Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Celso Benigno Luigi Cardinal Costantini

Deceased

Chancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1876BornCastions di Zoppola
26 Dec 189923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
22 Jul 192145.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
24 Aug 192145.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
12 Aug 192246.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to China
9 Sep 192246.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis in Arcadia
28 May 193155.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Harbin [Harbin], China
28 Nov 193357.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Harbin [Harbin], China
20 Dec 193559.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
12 Jan 195376.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
12 Jan 195376.7Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 195376.7ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
22 May 195478.1AppointedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery
9 Jun 195882.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
17 Oct 195882.5DiedChancellor of the Apostolic Chancery

MicroData Summary for Celso Benigno Luigi Costantini:
Celso Benigno Luigi Cardinal Costantini (born , died ) Chancellor of Apostolic Chancery

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
  • a cardinal for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jan 1953
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015