Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tadeusz Wojda, S.A.C.

Archbishop of Białystok, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1957 Born
1977¹19.9EnteredMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
1982²24.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
8 May 198326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
12 Apr 201760.2AppointedArchbishop of Białystok, Poland
10 Jun 201760.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Białystok, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Wojda (VIAF: 166972235)
Archbishop Tadeusz Wojda S.A.C. (born ) Archbishop of Białystok

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKowala, Diocese of Kielce
Ordained PriestOur Lady Queen of Apostles, Ożarow Mazowiecki
Ordained BishopCathedral, Białystok, Archdiocese of Białystok

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Białystok.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 12 Apr 2017
  • c34: CB, 3 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017