Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Savio Hon Tai-Fai, S.D.B.

Apostolic Nuncio to Greece

Titular Archbishop of Sila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1950 Born
15 Aug 196918.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Aug 197524.8Perpetual VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Jul 198231.7Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
23 Dec 201060.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
23 Dec 201060.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sila
5 Feb 201160.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sila
6 Jun 201665.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
31 Oct 201666.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
28 Sep 201766.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Greece

MicroData Summary for Savio Hon Tai-Fai (VIAF: 258915361)
Archbishop Savio Hon Tai-Fai S.D.B. (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Greece

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHong Kong
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Greece.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,945
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Sep 2017