Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henryk Franciszek Hoser, S.A.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1942Born
1969²26.0EnteredMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
8 Sep 197027.7ProfessedMember of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
16 Jun 197431.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Catholic Apostolate
22 Jan 200562.1AppointedOfficial of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
22 Jan 200562.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tepelta
19 Mar 200562.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tepelta
24 May 200865.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
28 Jun 200865.5InstalledBishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
8 Dec 201775.0RetiredBishop of Warszawa-Praga, Poland
13 Aug 202178.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga, Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henryk Franciszek Hoser (VIAF: 250624103)
Archbishop Henryk Franciszek Hoser S.A.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Warszawa-Praga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVarsavia
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceCentralny Szpital Kliniczny MSWiA, Warszawa, Archdiocese of Warszawa {Warsaw}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Warszawa, Diocese of Warszawa-Praga

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,839
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 May 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 Sep 2021

Quantcast