Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Octavio Ruiz Arenas

Secretary Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization

Archbishop Emeritus of Villavicencio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1944 Born
29 Nov 196924.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
8 Mar 199651.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
8 Mar 199651.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Troyna
13 Apr 199651.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troyna
16 Jul 200257.5AppointedBishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
3 Jul 200459.5AppointedArchbishop of Villavicencio, Colombia
31 May 200762.4AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Commission for Latin America
13 May 201166.3AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization
2 Sep 202075.6RetiredSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization

MicroData Summary for José Octavio Ruiz Arenas
Archbishop José Octavio Ruiz Arenas (born ) Secretary Emeritus of Promoting the New Evangelization

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá, Colombia
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá, Colombia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Council for Promoting the New Evangelization.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,741
  • r: AM, 16 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast