Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Spinelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1694BornNaples
8 Mar 172228.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Apr 172430.2Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 172531.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
6 Sep 172531.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
28 Oct 172531.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
May 1732³38.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
15 Dec 173440.8AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
17 Jan 173540.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Mar 173541.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
25 Sep 175258.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
9 Apr 175359.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
8 Feb 175460.0ResignedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Jul 1756³62.4AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Council
11 Sep 175662.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
Jan 1757³62.9ResignedPro-Prefect of the Congregation of the Council
13 Jul 175965.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
13 Jul 176167.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
12 Apr 176369.1DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Spinelli
Giuseppe Cardinal Spinelli (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 37.4 years
  • a cardinal for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Jan 1735
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016