Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Marchetti Selvaggiani

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

Secretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Dean of the College of Cardinals


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1871BornRoma
4 Apr 189624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
16 Feb 191846.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
16 Feb 191846.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Venezuela
14 Apr 191846.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
21 May 192048.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venezuela
4 Dec 192049.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
15 Dec 192251.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
30 Jun 193058.7Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 193058.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria Nuova
9 May 193159.6AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
26 May 193159.6AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
15 Jun 193664.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
30 Apr 193967.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Holy Office
5 May 194876.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
21 Jun 194876.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia
21 Jun 194876.7ConfirmedDean of the College of Cardinals
13 Jan 195179.2DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies

MicroData Summary for Francesco Marchetti Selvaggiani:
Francesco Cardinal Marchetti Selvaggiani (born , died ) Prefect of Ceremonies

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 18
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014