Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Tomás Cardinal Sánchez

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1920BornPandan
12 May 194626.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sorsogon, Philippines
5 Feb 196847.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines
5 Feb 196847.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesvi
12 May 196848.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesvi
13 Dec 197151.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lucena, Philippines
25 Sep 197656.5SucceededBishop of Lucena, Philippines
12 Jan 198261.8AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
30 Oct 198565.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
22 Mar 198666.0ResignedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
28 Jun 199171.3Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199171.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna
1 Jul 199171.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
1 Jul 199171.3AppointedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
4 May 199373.1ResignedPresident of the Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See
15 Jun 199676.2RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Clergy
26 Feb 200281.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pio V a Villa Carpegna
9 Mar 201292.0DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Clergy

MicroData Summary for José Tomás Sánchez:
José Tomás Cardinal Sánchez (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Clergy

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.8 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 15 Feb 2014