Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Domenico Maria Cardinal Jacobini

Deceased

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro

Prefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1837Born
10 Sep 187942.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
16 Nov 188043.2ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
4 Aug 188143.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
14 Aug 188143.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
31 Mar 188244.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
16 Jun 189153.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
22 Jun 189658.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189658.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
3 Dec 189659.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
14 Dec 189962.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Residence of Bishops
14 Dec 189962.2AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Feb 190062.4DiedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Maria Jacobini (VIAF: 90207409)
Domenico Maria Cardinal Jacobini (born , died ) Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
  • a cardinal for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 574, and Page 49
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jun 1896
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 44
  • x933/nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 23, and Page 215

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast