Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ercole Cardinal Consalvi

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1757Born
15 Mar 180042.7AppointedPro-Secretary of the Secretariat of State
11 Aug 180043.1AppointedSecretary of State
11 Aug 180043.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Oct 180043.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
21 Dec 180144.5Ordained DeaconCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
Jun 1806³48.9ResignedSecretary of State
19 May 181456.9AppointedSecretary of State
28 Jul 181760.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
23 Mar 182264.7AppointedPro-Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
20 Aug 182366.1ResignedSecretary of State
13 Jan 182466.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
24 Jan 182466.6DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ercole Consalvi (VIAF: 19702643)
Ercole Cardinal Consalvi (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceAnzio
Buried Place (Original)S. Marcello al Corso, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 7, and Page 8
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Aug 1800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast