Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Luigi Cardinal Fontana, B. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1750Born
177423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
19 Jul 181463.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
8 Mar 181665.5Elevated to Cardinal
8 Mar 181665.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
30 Jun 181665.8AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
24 Sep 181868.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
19 Mar 182271.5DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Francesco Luigi Fontana (VIAF: 88564418)
Francesco Luigi Cardinal Fontana B. (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastelmaggiore, Diocese of Cremona, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a cardinal for 6.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast