Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ivan Cornelius Cardinal Dias

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Cardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1936Born
8 Dec 195822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bombay, India
8 May 198246.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rusibisir
8 May 198246.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Ghana
8 May 198246.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Benin
8 May 198246.0AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Togo
19 Jun 198246.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rusibisir
20 Jun 198751.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Korea
28 Oct 199155.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Albania
8 Nov 199660.5AppointedArchbishop of Bombay, India
21 Feb 200164.8Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 200164.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella
20 May 200670.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
10 May 201175.0RetiredPrefect of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
19 Jun 201781.1DiedPrefect Emeritus of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

MicroData Summary for Ivan Cornelius Dias (VIAF: 206227895)
Ivan Cornelius Cardinal Dias (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Evangelization of Peoples

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBombay, Archdiocese of Bombay, India
Ordained PriestBombay, Archdiocese of Bombay, India
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
  • a cardinal for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 May 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 10 May 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 19 Jun 2017
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 18 Oct 2017