Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Laurenti

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of Rites

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1861BornMonteporzio Catone
7 Jun 188422.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
12 Aug 191149.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
21 Jun 192159.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 192159.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria della Scala
5 Jul 192260.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Affairs of Religious
12 Mar 192967.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites
16 Dec 193574.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Scala
6 Sep 193876.7DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Rites

MicroData Summary for Camillo Laurenti:
Camillo Cardinal Laurenti (born , died ) Prefect of Rites

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a cardinal for 17.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014