Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Willem Marinus Cardinal van Rossum, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme

President of the Pontifical Biblical Commission


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1854Born
16 Jun 187419.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
17 Oct 187925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
27 Nov 191157.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191157.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
13 Jan 191459.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Biblical Commission
1 Oct 191561.0AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
6 Dec 191561.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
12 Mar 191863.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
25 Apr 191863.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
19 May 191863.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
19 May 191863.7ResignedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Mauretania
30 Aug 193277.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Willem Marinus van Rossum
Willem Marinus Cardinal van Rossum C.SS.R. (born , died ) Prefect of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZwolle

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,918, Number 25
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 99
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 517, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 680, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 1 Jan 2020

Quantcast