Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Silvio Cardinal Valenti Gonzaga

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Prefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1690BornMantua, Italy
20 May 173141.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Jun 173141.2Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jun 173141.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
22 Jul 173141.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
20 Oct 173141.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
2 Feb 173645.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
Mar 1736³46.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
19 Dec 173848.7Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1739³49.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
20 Aug 174050.4AppointedSecretary of State
16 Sep 174050.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
25 Feb 174756.9AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
27 Mar 174757.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
15 May 174757.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
9 Apr 175363.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
28 Aug 175666.4DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Silvio Valenti Gonzaga (VIAF: 52598051)
Silvio Cardinal Valenti Gonzaga (born , died ) Secretary of State

  • a priest for 25.2 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1738
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 24
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 267

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016