Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Barberini (Jr.), O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1607Born
30 Aug 162720.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 Feb 162820.5Elevated to Cardinal
28 Feb 162820.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
18 Mar 162820.6AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
24 Nov 163225.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
Dec 1632³25.3AppointedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
19 Mar 163325.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 163830.9AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
10 Nov 164235.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
1645¹37.4ResignedPrefect of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
21 Jul 165345.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
16 Aug 165346.0SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
11 Oct 165548.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
24 Oct 165548.2Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
27 Jun 165749.8SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
18 Jul 165749.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
21 Nov 166154.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
3 Aug 1671³63.9DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Antonio Barberini (Jr.) (VIAF: 41833880)
Antonio Cardinal Barberini (Jr.) O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopNovitiate of the Jesuits, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceNemi, Suburbicarian See of Albano, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Chapel of S. Lorenzo, Cathedral, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Santa Rosalia, Church, Palestrina, Suburbicarian See of Palestrina, Italy

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
  • a cardinal for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 33
  • op/c1: AT, 6 Sep 2016
  • op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • loc: AT, 4 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jan 2017