Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Ciasca, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1835Born
11 Mar 185721.8ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
18 Sep 185823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
19 May 189156.0AppointedPrefect of the Vatican Secret Archives
1 Jun 189156.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
7 Jun 189156.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
19 Sep 189257.3AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
4 Jul 189358.1AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
19 Jun 189964.1Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189964.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
6 Feb 190266.7DiedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith

MicroData Summary for Agostino Ciasca (VIAF: 71930360)
Agostino Cardinal Ciasca O.E.S.A. (born , died ) Secretary of Propagation of the Faith

EventPlace
Birth Placevia Grangidlio n. 60, Polignano a Mare, Diocese of Monopoli, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlacePalazzo Cerasi, via dell'Babuino n.51, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Augustinian Order Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)S. Maria del Popolo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 334, and Page 47
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899
  • c134: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1891, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017