Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal Bedini

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1806Born
20 Dec 182822.5Ordained PriestPriest of Senigallia, Italy
28 Oct 184539.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
16 Aug 184741.2ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
15 Mar 185245.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
18 Mar 185245.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
4 Jul 185246.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
16 Jun 185650.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Propagation of the Faith
18 Mar 186154.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
27 Sep 186155.3Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 186155.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria sopra Minerva
6 Sep 186458.3DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Bedini (VIAF: 56603544)
Gaetano Cardinal Bedini (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSenigallia
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Portico, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
  • a cardinal for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 27 Sep 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 545, and Page 593
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 50
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 28
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 76, and Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 10 Mar 2018