Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Protacio Guevarra Gungon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Antipolo, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1925Born
29 Mar 195226.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
8 Jul 197752.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
8 Jul 197752.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
24 Aug 197752.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
24 Jan 198357.5AppointedBishop of Antipolo, Philippines
25 Jun 198358.0InstalledBishop of Antipolo, Philippines
18 Oct 200176.3RetiredBishop of Antipolo, Philippines
26 Apr 201488.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Antipolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Protacio Guevarra Gungon
Bishop Protacio Guevarra Gungon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Antipolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • i: CB, 10 Feb 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,066

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast