Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fernando Montero Espinosa

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1639AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
3 Feb 1640Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
5 Feb 1646AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
1648²DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fernando Montero Espinosa
Archbishop Fernando Montero Espinosa (died 1648) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSanta Clara, Church, Madrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,323
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,402
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261, and Page 230
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 169, Number 1,056
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 41
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast