Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Federico O. Escaler, S.J.

Prelate Emeritus of Ipil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1922 BornManila
19 Jun 195432.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
12 Jun 197654.0AppointedPrelate of Kidapawan, Philippines
12 Jun 197654.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
31 Jul 197654.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
6 Sep 197654.2InstalledPrelate of Kidapawan, Philippines
18 Feb 197855.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Girus Tarasii
23 Feb 198057.7AppointedPrelate of Ipil, Philippines
28 Jun 199775.0RetiredPrelate of Ipil, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Federico O. Escaler:
Bishop Federico O. Escaler S.J. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Ipil

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Ipil.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014