Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Angel Rodríguez, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1687³BornMedina del Campo, Spain
17 Dec 173144.7AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Nov 173649.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
24 Jun 174255.2DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Angel Rodríguez:
Archbishop Juan Angel Rodríguez O.SS.T. (born , died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 5.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 55, Number 240
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015