Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Alan Verdejo Dialogo

Bishop of Sorsogon, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1962 Born
31 Jul 199634.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
15 Oct 201957.2AppointedBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
12 Dec 201957.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
14 Dec 201957.4InstalledBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jose Alan Verdejo Dialogo
Bishop Jose Alan Verdejo Dialogo (born ) Bishop of Sorsogon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagonoy, Camarines Norte, Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral Basilica, Intramuros, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sorsogon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2019
  • mn: CB, 16 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 12 Dec 2019

Quantcast