Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique de Vera Macaraeg

Bishop of Tarlac, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1955 Born
19 May 197923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
31 Mar 201660.2AppointedBishop of Tarlac, Philippines
24 May 201660.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarlac, Philippines
31 May 201660.4InstalledBishop of Tarlac, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Enrique de Vera Macaraeg
Bishop Enrique de Vera Macaraeg (born ) Bishop of Tarlac

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManila

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarlac.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 13 Apr 2016
  • mn/c12: CB, 19 May 2016
  • c34: CB, 23 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,921

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast