Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Socrates Buenaventura Villegas

Archbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1960 BornManila
5 Oct 198525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Manila, Philippines
25 Jul 200140.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
25 Jul 200140.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nona
31 Aug 200140.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nona
3 May 200443.6AppointedBishop of Balanga, Philippines
3 Jul 200443.8InstalledBishop of Balanga, Philippines
8 Sep 200948.9AppointedArchbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines
4 Nov 200949.1InstalledArchbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Socrates Buenaventura Villegas:
Archbishop Socrates Buenaventura Villegas (born ) Archbishop of Lingayen-Dagupan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lingayen-Dagupan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,032
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 12 Dec 2013