Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia

Archidioecesis Novae Segobiae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Marlo Mendoza Peralta, Archbishop
  • David William Valencia Antonio, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Edmundo M. Abaya, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Ernesto Antolin Salgado, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 June 1951
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 2,570 (992 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the province of Ilocos Sur
  • Mailing Address: Vigan City, 2700 Ilocos Sur, Philippines
  • Telephone: (077)722-20-18; 722-20-19
  • Fax: 722-15-91

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Nueva Segovia
14 August 1595ErectedDiocese of Manila Diocese of Nueva Segovia (erected)
Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia
29 June 1951ElevatedDiocese of Nueva Segovia Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia
19 January 1970Territory LostArchdiocese of Nueva Segovia Diocese of San Fernando de La Union (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Nueva Segovia
1950589,676851,67369.2%102491513,9052015780ap1951
Archdiocese of Nueva Segovia
1970365,000.0%8616102021534ap1971
1980423,000521,00081.2%5317706,0422718735ap1981
1990464,000548,00084.7%5514696,72431420040ap1991
1999503,397599,88583.9%565618,252512240ap2000
2000518,822609,73985.1%583618,505312940ap2001
2001519,172611,34784.9%583618,511316840ap2002
2003524,999617,46085.0%635687,720516240ap2004
2004523,813621,92384.2%695747,078516240ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 22 Feb 2014