Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rolando Joven Tria Tirona, O.C.D.

Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1946 BornKawit-Cavite
1967²20.4ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
21 Apr 197427.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
15 Nov 199448.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
15 Nov 199448.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
29 Dec 199448.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vulturaria
14 Dec 199650.4AppointedBishop of Malolos, Philippines
28 Jun 200356.9AppointedPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
27 Aug 200357.1InstalledPrelate of Infanta, Philippines
8 Sep 201266.1AppointedArchbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres), Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rolando Joven Tria Tirona:
Archbishop Rolando Joven Tria Tirona O.C.D. (born ) Archbishop of Caceres (Nueva Caceres)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Caceres (Nueva Caceres).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,533
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013