Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Vázquez de Mercado

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1533²Born
5 Nov 160370.8AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
13 Jun 160471.4Ordained BishopBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
28 May 160875.4AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
12 Jun 161683.4DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Vázquez de Mercado
Archbishop Diego Vázquez de Mercado (born 1533, died ) Archbishop of Manila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArévalo, Spain

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 119, Number 760
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 230, and Page 375
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1604, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast