Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Arayata Arcaira

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Malolos

Titular Bishop of Acrassus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1902BornTanza
26 Oct 193027.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 196158.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
6 Nov 196158.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acrassus
25 Jan 196259.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acrassus
17 Oct 196663.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Malolos, Philippines
25 Jan 198885.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Malolos, Philippines
19 Nov 199492.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Malolos, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Arayata Arcaira:
Bishop Leopoldo Arayata Arcaira (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Malolos

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 7
  • mn: CB, 28 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 17 Aug 2015